HI HB1446 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Providing options for a refundable Renewable Energy Technology Systems Tax Credit for qualified taxpayers. (HB1446 HD1)
Title
Renewable energy technologies; income tax credit; refund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chang, Chong, Har, Herkes, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-19-09 10:00am in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-19-09. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-17-09 9:00 am in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |