HI HB1440 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-24 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-24 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Uniform Guardianship, Conservatorship, and Other Protective Arrangements Act. Repeals the superseded Uniform Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Act.
Title
Relating To The Uniform Guardianship, Conservatorship, And Other Protective Arrangements Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] |
Rep. Rachele Fernandez Lamosao [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1440 (Carry Over) 2023-02-24 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1595 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
SB1595 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1440&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1440_.HTM |