HI HB1440 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires driver education programs to include the distribution of information on organ and tissue donation. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1440 HD1)
Title
Driver Education Programs; Organ Donation; Designation of Anatomical Gifts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH/TIA, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 366). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Cheape. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13 at 9:30am. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-22-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, HLT, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |