HI HB143 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB143
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the coffee labeling requirements to include ready-to-drink coffee beverages. (HB143 HD1)
Title
Relating To Coffee Labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 359) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Holt; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB894 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB143 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
HB143 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).