HI HB1424 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals references in the campaign spending law that have been repealed. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Candidate Committee And Noncandidate Committee Organizational Reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ward. |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-04-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-22 9:30AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-02-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2043 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 171, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).