HI HB1419 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits protests within 300 feet of the entrance of any cemetery that has received funds through the Office of Veterans' Services from 60 minutes before to 60 minutes after a funeral. (HB1419 HD1)
Title
Veterans' Funerals; Protests
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 414) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Wakai. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-12-09 7:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EBM, JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |