HI HB1415 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1415
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to conduct a study on the need for the Hawaii Care Plan to provide health insurance for any individual who is not otherwise eligible for medicaid. (HB1415 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Friday, 02-01-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1415 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).