HI HB141 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the exemption from the civil service laws for personal services contracts for building, custodial, and grounds maintenance services with qualified community rehabilitation programs at a cost of no more than $850,000 by specifying that the $850,000 maximum applies per contract.
Title
Civil Service Law; Qualified Community Rehabilitation Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 29). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-17-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=141&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB141_.HTM |