HI HB1388 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1388
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends definitions in chapter 578A, HRS, to clarify that any proper adult person or family, regardless of marital status, may be approved by DHS or another authorized agency to provide foster care services for children.
Title
Relating To Foster Care Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1388 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1388&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1388_.HTM |