HI HB1377 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to develop the specifications and pricing, as well as an implementation plan, for a web-based data system in the early intervention section of the Department of Health. Makes an appropriation for operating expenses and to establish one permanent coordinator position in the Children with Special Health Needs Branch of the Department of Health to improve developmental, social-emotional, and behavioral outcomes for children from birth to age five. (SD1)
Title
Keiki Caucus; Child Health; Early Intervention; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 229. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-30-15 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 229. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 8:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Chun Oakland, Riviere Co-Chairs; Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1441) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HSH, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 315). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-11-15 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |