HI HB1373 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to provide health care for uninsured Hawaii residents through nonprofit community-based health care providers. (SD1)
Title
Health Care for the Uninsured
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS deferred the measure until 03-20-09 2:40PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-09 1:45 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 255). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-09 2:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Belatti, Bertram, Carroll, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT-HUS on Friday, 02-06-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |