HI HB1365 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the operating budget for the Department of Agriculture for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Agriculture Budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 287).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback