HI HB1364 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the refundable food/excise tax credit and makes the credit nonrefundable. Authorizes the Department of Taxation to issue the tax credit to taxpayers annually rather than requiring taxpayers to file for the credit. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2023.
Title
Relating To Tax Credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-08-23 10:15AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1364 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1364&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1364_.HTM |