HI HB1352 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a comprehensive financial, management, and program audit of the Department of Education. Appropriates funds. (HB1352 HD1)
Title
Department of Education; Comprehensive Financial, Management, and Program Audit ($)
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1148) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 311). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 631) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |