HI HB135 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that certain candidates shall file disclosures of financial interests no later than 10 days after the nomination filing deadline. Establishes that the unauthorized release of confidential financial disclosure information is subject to chapter 84, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Amends the fines imposed and procedures relating to disclosures of financial interests.
Title
Relating To Disclosures Of Financial Interests.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 120), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB135 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB182 (Same As) 2023-06-23 - Act 129, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
SB182 (Same As) 2023-06-23 - Act 129, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=135&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB135_.HTM |