HI HB135 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a temporary restraining order to remain in effect for 90 days or until the effective date of a protective order, whichever occurs first. Provides that protective orders orally stated by the court on the record shall be effective as of the date of the hearing if the respondent attends the hearing or, if the respondent was served but failed to appear, then upon service of the protective order upon the respondent until further order of the court. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB135 HD1)
Title
Domestic Abuse Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Belatti. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-03-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |