HI HB1349 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits composting and co-composting operations in agricultural districts. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Statewide Composting.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-21. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1349 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).