HI HB134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a fee on the carbon content of fossil fuels. Establishes a carbon cashback trust fund into which fees will be deposited and dividend payments will be made to Hawaii residents. Effective for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021.
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB134 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB311 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to EET, WAM.
SB311 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=134&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB134_.HTM |