HI HB133 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an income tax credit for costs incurred in hotel construction or renovation. (HB133 HD1)
Title
Hotel Construction and Renovation; Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Taniguchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TSI, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 27). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 703), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB412 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.