HI HB1321 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an advisory committee to review state land use law. Requires the committee to submit reports to the legislature. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Land Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1321 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1321&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1321_.HTM |