HI HB1317 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax credit on a sliding scale for amounts paid for medical malpractice insurance premiums by physicians that move to, and practice medicine in, rural areas. (HB1317 HD1)
Title
Tax Credit; Physicians; Rural Areas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 18 | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Pine, Takai excused (2). | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-10-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |