HI HB1314 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires productions to provide evidence of reasonable efforts to comply, rather than actually comply, with all applicable requirements to qualify for the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit. Requires taxpayers be given notice and an opportunity to cure requirements for the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-10-23 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1314 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB795 (Same As) 2024-07-03 - Act 169, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
SB795 (Same As) 2024-07-03 - Act 169, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1314&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1314_HD1_.HTM |