HI HB1310 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Waiakea Peninsula Redevelopment District, Planning Committee, and Revolving Fund. (HB1310 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Waiakea Peninsula Redevelopment District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT/WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 182). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from TOU/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Tokioka, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-08 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU/WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-17 9:30AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2017-01-31 | House | Re-referred to TOU/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TOU, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1310 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
HB1310 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.