HI HB1310 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows public schools designated to be closed for the purpose of consolidation to remain open after imposition of tuition sufficient to cover the amount of cost savings that would have been realized from consolidation.
Title
Education; Closure and Consolidation of Schools; Tuition
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-02-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1380 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1310 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1310_.HTM |