HI HB1308 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1308

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes June 19 of each year as Juneteenth Day. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Juneteenth Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB939 (Same As)
HB1308 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback