HI HB1307 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a host municipality benefit fee to be assessed against landfill operators who violate solid waste pollution laws. Requires the State to distribute the fee to high schools within a five-mile radius of the penalized landfill.
Title
Host Municipality Benefit Fees; Landfills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1307&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1307_.HTM |