HI HB1305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any county with a population of 500,000 or more to form partnerships with certain qualifying nonprofit corporations to execute community-initiated development project within the county. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Community-initiated Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-15-23 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1305 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1305&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1305_.HTM |