HI HB1300 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisional or associate-level licensure requirements for marriage and family therapists, mental health counselors, and psychologists and authorizes insurance reimbursements in certain circumstances. Requires psychologist license applicants to possess a doctoral degree and complete certain supervised experience requirements before sitting for the licensing examination. Authorizes insurance reimbursements for services provided by a supervised social work intern in certain circumstances. Appropriates funds. Effective 6/30/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Chun Co-Chairs; Garcia. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Keohokalole, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 858) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 426). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-16 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-03 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB343 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, CPN.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Associate Licensure
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Examinations
Insurance Reimbursements
Marriage and Family Therapists
Mental Health
Mental Health Counselors
Provisional Licensure
Psychologists
Social Work Interns
Associate Licensure
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Examinations
Insurance Reimbursements
Marriage and Family Therapists
Mental Health
Mental Health Counselors
Provisional Licensure
Psychologists
Social Work Interns