HI HB1299 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOE to establish a career and technology center program, to include career and technology centers on Oahu, Hawaii, Maui, and Kauai, and auxiliary centers on Lanai and Molokai. Requires the DOE to report to the 2016 legislature on the development and implementation of the program.
Title
Education; Career and Technology Center Program
Sponsors
Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1299&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1299_.HTM |