HI HB1298 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 087, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 087, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers to the general fund the excess balances of various non-general funds from various state departments and agencies. Requires each department to annually submit to the Legislature program measures, costs elements, and accounting reports for all non-general funds under its control. Effective 6/30/2021. (CD1)
Title
Relating To State Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Act 087, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Act 087, 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Gabbard . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 150). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 150) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 575). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Cullen added as Conferee. |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-21 3:30PM in conference room CR 211. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; McDermott. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Kanuha, Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 776) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Gabbard, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-30-21 9:10AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 9:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 302). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Department of Accounting and General Services
Department of Agriculture
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Defense
Department of Education
Department of Health
Department of Human Resources Development
Department of Human Services
Department of Labor and Ind
Department of the Attorney General
Excess Balances
Non-general Funds
Reports to Legislature
Department of Agriculture
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Defense
Department of Education
Department of Health
Department of Human Resources Development
Department of Human Services
Department of Labor and Ind
Department of the Attorney General
Excess Balances
Non-general Funds
Reports to Legislature