HI HB129 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a mandatory recount shall occur when the difference in votes cast is equal to or less than 100 votes or one-quarter of 1% of the total number of votes cast for the contest, whichever is lesser. Establishes that the filing deadline for a complaint for a contest for cause that arises from a mandatory recount shall be the same as the filing deadline for complaints for contests in which no mandatory recount was held.
Title
Relating To Recounts.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 11). |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=129&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB129_.HTM |