HI HB1286 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1286
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts any person from the post-arrival mandatory selfquarantine if the person receives a negative test result prior to arrival. Allows the governor to establish statewide conditions for exemption. Requires certain COVID-19 tests for travelers who do not have a test result upon arrival to avoid mandatory self-quarantine. Requires any person who does not obtain a negative test result for COVID-19 pre-arrival to be responsible for all costs associated with that person's mandatory self-quarantine. Prohibits the suspension of this Act except by legislative approval via a concurrent resolution. Repeals on 12/31/2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Travel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/PSM/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/PSM/HTH, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 169). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Okimoto, Perruso, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Takumi, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 838), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten; 3 Noes: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Perruso, Wildberger; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, McKelvey, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Nakamura, Perruso, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (5) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Har, McKelvey, Okimoto, Perruso, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (5) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from PDP/LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP/LAT on Tuesday, 02-09-21 8:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to PDP/LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1286 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.