HI HB1282 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Act 009, 4/10/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Act 009, 4/10/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the scope of eligibility requirements for the Hawaii Medal of Honor to include additional service members. (HB1282 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Medal of Honor; Title 10 Status
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Act 009, 4/10/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2013-04-10 | House | Act 009, on 4/10/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2013-03-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 404). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-22-13. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 2:55PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 151). |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-31 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 10 |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading. |