HI HB1280 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the use of solitary confinement in state-operated and state-contracted correctional facilities, with certain specified exceptions. Requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to use appropriate alternatives to solitary confinement for inmates who are members of a vulnerable population. Requires the department to develop written policies and implement procedures by 7/1/2024. Defines "member of a vulnerable population." Requires a report to the Legislature.
Title
Relating To Corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB347 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1280 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1280 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Correctional Facilities
Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Inmates
Report
Restrictions
Solitary Confinement
Vulnerable Populations
Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Inmates
Report
Restrictions
Solitary Confinement
Vulnerable Populations
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1280&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1280_.HTM |