HI HB1271 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1271
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dissolves the agribusiness development corporation and transfers all lands and staff, except for the executive director, to the department of agriculture.
Title
Relating To The Agribusiness Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 99). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Morikawa, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Morikawa, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-17-21 at 10:00 am. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1271 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to AEN/EET, JDC/WAM.