HI HB1271 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1271
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Commission on Criminal Justice and Sentencing Reform in the Governor's Office to develop sentencing and corrections policies to reduce the State's incarcerated population, reduce correctional spending, increase public safety, and reduce recidivism.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1271 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1271&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1271_.HTM |