HI HB1271 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1271
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, EEP, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, EEP, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts safeguards regarding the use of pesticides at private child day care centers.
Title
Relating To Private Child Day Care Centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, EEP, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, EEP, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1271 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to HLT/HUS, EEP, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1271&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1271_.HTM |