HI HB1271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires 50 per cent of public utility taxes collected to be deposited into the general fund. Repealed on 7/1/16.
Title
Public Service Company Tax; General Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 145), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Marumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Ching. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |