HI HB1266 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1266
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows wild game to be donated as food. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Food Donations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS, JDC. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 423). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-13 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia. |
2023-02-13 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2023-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/HLT on Monday, 02-13-23 2:05PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR/HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1266 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.