HI HB1263 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the order of succession to the office of lieutenant governor. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Order Of Succession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1421) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/JDC, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 109). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 898), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1263 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB854 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
SB854 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to GVO, WAM.