HI HB1262 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of first degree murder to include causing the death of a person who is a witness to a family court proceeding alleging a law violation by a minor.
Title
Criminal Offenses; Murder; Family Court Proceedings
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 288), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Pine. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-07-11 9:35AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |