HI HB1248 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on TRE/ETT/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-17 1:45PM in conference room 225.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on TRE/ETT/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-17 1:45PM in conference room 225.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of a NELHA microgrid demonstration project for the generation, storage, and distribution of renewable energy on property controlled by NELHA. (HB1248 HD2)
Title
Relating To Microgrids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/ETT/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-17 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/ETT/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/ETT/CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 331). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino. |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 11:01AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1248 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on TRE/ETT/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-17 1:45PM in conference room 225.