HI HB1235 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a 7.5% of the conveyance tax revenues collected each fiscal year to be paid into the Kahoolawe rehabilitation trust fund for the long-term rehabilitation and maintenance of the Kahoolawe island reserve.
Title
Kahoolawe Rehabilitation Trust Fund; Conveyance Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1235&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1235_.HTM |