HI HB1229 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an additional $5,000 per year bonus for teachers who maintain current national board certification and teach in a Title 1 school under the Teacher National Board Certification Incentive Program.
Title
Teachers; Incentives; Title I Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB842 (Same As) 2015-02-09 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1229&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1229_.HTM |