HI HB1225 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows bingo to be conducted by 1 licensee at 1 location on lands designated by the Hawaiian homes commission. Creates Hawaii bingo commission within department of commerce and consumer affairs to regulate bingo. Allocates 20% of general excise tax on gross receipts to the state general fund; 1% for a compulsive gambler program; up to 4% for administrative expenses; and the balance for deposit into the Hawaiian home lands trust fund.
Title
Bingo; One Location; Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Cullen, Fontaine, Hashem, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 581), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Morita. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-17-11 3:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Cullen, Fontaine, Johanson, M. Lee, Marumoto, Morita, Nishimoto, Takai, Takumi, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no (15) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Hashem excused (2). | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamane, Pine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-09-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |