HI HB1223 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1223
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a teacher loan program to encourage individuals to become teachers in hard-to-fill positions of department of education schools. Allows the loan to be forgiven after five years of teaching in a hard-to-fill position. Establishes a similar teacher loan program for public charter schools. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Teacher Loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 117). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-07-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1137 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1223 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
HB1223 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1223&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1223_HD1_.HTM |