HI HB1223 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the state board for career and technical education to oversee and review annually statewide data collection processes and reporting requirements related to the student attainment of industry-recognized credentials. Requires certain agencies to collect and report disaggregated data on students' attainment of industry-recognized credentials. Requires certain agencies to pursue data-sharing agreements with credentialing entities. Requires an annual report to the governor and legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2021-02-11HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 162) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2021-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB516 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback