HI HB1222 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the scope of the Hawaiian language college revolving fund at the University of Hawaii at Hilo to allow any funds generated by the Hawaiian language college, Hawaiian language support center, and indigenous outreach program through fees for services, training, and the sale of all products to be deposited into the revolving fund and expended at the discretion of the Hawaiian language college.
Title
Hawaiian Language College; Revolving Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1248 (Same As) 2015-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1222&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1222_.HTM |