HI HB1209 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the legislative broadcast program to make an audio or audiovisual recording of all public hearings and informational briefings held at the State Capitol, and maintain an archive of the recordings to be made available to the public. Appropriates an unspecified sum to be shared equally between the senate and the house of representatives. Effective 7/1/30. (SD2)
Title
Public Access Room; Legislative Broadcast Program; Record; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nishimoto, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Mizuno, Johanson. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1028) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 03-21-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Awana, Cachola, Saiki, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Friday, 02-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |