HI HB1207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1207
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the environmental response, energy, and food security tax the environmental response tax. Repeals the deposit of taxes collected on barrels of petroleum products into the energy security special fund, energy systems development special fund, and agricultural development and food security special fund. Requires all taxes collected on each one million British thermal units of fossil fuels to be deposited into the general fund.
Title
Relating To Environmental Response.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1207 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1207&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1207_.HTM |